Levin, Harvey (CPSO#: 33764)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1982
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: July 4, 2003
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 4, 2003, Dr. Harvey Levin was found to be an incapacitated member as defined by subsection 1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991.