Levin, Phillip David (CPSO#: 78372)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cambridge, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004