Levine, Daniel Simon (CPSO#: 81219)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Birmingham, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 03 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 03 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006