Levine, Joseph David (CPSO#: 18645)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Lausanne, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph D. Levine, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2006

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 2006