Levine, Leonard Ivan (CPSO#: 20995)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012