Levine, Noah Charles (CPSO#: 70333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pine Seven Medical Centre
Suite 180
4600 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-3330
Fax: (905) 856-3331
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Clinic
2000 Williams Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6S 6B3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

30 Novopharm Court
care of Occupational Health Dept
Toronto ON  M1B 2K9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2100 Syntex Court
? Occupational Health Department
Mississauga ON  L5N 7K9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Levine ( CPSO# 70333 )

Business Address:
180 - 4600 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-3330

Business Address:
2000 Williams Parkway
Brampton ON  L6S 6B3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOAH CHARLES LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998