Levine, Richard Harold (CPSO#: 32462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
149 Second Avenue
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1S 2H6
Phone: (613) 594-4935
Fax: (613) 594-4935
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Levine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 32462 )

Business Address:
149 Second Avenue
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1S 2H6
Phone Number: (613) 594-4935

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD HAROLD LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1985