Levine, Ronald Harold (CPSO#: 50932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Suite 650
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W4
Phone: (416) 236-2581
Fax: (416) 236-2695
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Levine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 50932 )
Dr. S. Judah ( CPSO# 50869 )

Business Address:
Suite 650
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2W4
Phone Number: (416) 236-2581

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
300 - 1131A Leslie Street
North York ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 360-7360


Corporation Name: Sybil Judah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 50932 )
Dr. S. Judah ( CPSO# 50869 )

Business Address:
1131 Leslie Street
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 360-7360

Business Address:
Suite 650
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2W4
Phone Number: (416) 237-1455

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD HAROLD LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985