Levine, Sharon Susan (CPSO#: 53155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6772
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON SUSAN LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1983