Levinsky, Elyse Shifra (CPSO#: 69119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2000


Former Name: Conn, Elyse Shifra (used until: 04 Mar 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
3rd Floor
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-3108
Fax: (416) 586-3145
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2009

Dr. E. Levinsky ( CPSO# 69119 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-3108

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ELYSE SHIFRA LEVINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2000