Levinson, Ari David (CPSO#: 65726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 691-3111
Fax: (416) 691-9957
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Albany Medical Clinic
Toronto ON  M4K 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-9471 Ext. 0000
Fax: (416) 461-2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

ACD
Toronto ON  M1K 3A6
Canada
Phone: (647) 351-6646
Fax: (647) 351-6648
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Cardiology Associates
837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M3B 1T3
Canada
Phone: (416) 465-5464
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Levinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Levinson ( CPSO# 65726 )

Business Address:
206 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 691-3111


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARI DAVID LEVINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1996