Levis, Carolyn Mary (CPSO#: 63821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Department Surgery MGW
Room 820
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 308-9419
Fax: (905) 525-6424
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

711 Concession
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: 9059215030
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 9055212100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Levis ( CPSO# 63821 )

Business Address:
100 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Department Surgery MGW
50 Charlton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 922-6122

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 321-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street West
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN MARY LEVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1992