Levis, Michael David (CPSO#: 56537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamad Medical Corporation
PO Box 3050
Doha, Qatar
Doha 00000
Qatar
Phone: +974 33056787

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Qatar

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID LEVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1986