Levitsky, Neil Stewart (CPSO#: 57092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Phone: (416) 515-7741
Fax: (416) 515-0241
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL STEWART LEVITSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVITSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1987