Levitt, David Stephen (CPSO#: 58307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 48000
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID STEPHEN LEVITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988