Levstik, Mark Anthony (CPSO#: 66272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Mar 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University or Rochester
Strong Memorial Hospital
Box: Transplant Surgery
601 Elmwood Avenue
Rochester NY  14642
United States
Phone: 5852733881
Fax: 5852717929
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levstik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 15 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ANTHONY LEVSTIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVSTIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1993