Levy, Lance David (CPSO#: 31032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1979

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
174 Duplex Avenue
Toronto ON  M5P 2A9
Phone: (416) 489-0180
Fax: (416) 488-3844
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lance Levy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Levy ( CPSO# 31032 )

Business Address:
174 Duplex Avenue
Toronto ON  M5P 2A9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANCE DAVID LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1979
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 25 Oct 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Feb 2003
Summary:

On February 25, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Levy committed an act of professional misconduct in that he 
engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medcine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably 
be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The Committee ordered the following: 
 
      i)    That the Registrar shall suspend Dr. Levy s certificate of registration for a period of one year commencing on 
            the date of this order; 
       
      ii)   The Registrar shall suspend four months of this suspension on the condition that Dr. Levy provides 
            confirmation to the College that he has complied with the conditions set out in subparagraphs (iii) to (xii) 
            below;  
       
      iii)  Dr. Levy will attend before this panel of the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
            reprimand to be recorded on the register; 
 
      iv)   Dr. Levy will provide a formal apology to the complainant; 
 
      v)    Dr. Levy will pay to the College $10,000.00, to be held by the College in trust, to guarantee the payment of 
            any amount the College may pay out in respect of LB for funding for therapy and counseling, or in the 
            alternative, Dr. Levy will post a letter of credit in the sum of $10,000.00 for same, so long as it is permitted 
            by law in the circumstances of Dr. Levy s bankruptcy; 
 
      vi)   Dr. Levy will submit to an assessment of his fitness to practice by a psychiatrist acceptable to the College, 
            and prior to returning to practice at the conclusion of his suspension, Dr. Levy will provide the psychiatrist s 
            report, acceptable to the College, certifying his fitness to practise; 
 
      vii)  Dr. Levy will attend, at his own expense, the boundaries course offered by the College no later than 
            September 12 and 13, 2003; 
 
      viii) Dr. Levy will attend, at his own expense, the records keeping course offered by the College no later than 
            September, 2003; 
 
       ix)  Dr. Levy will accept an inspection of his practice by a person or persons designated by the College; 
       
       x)   Dr. Levy will accept supervision or other reasonable terms and conditions that the College might identify 
            through its inspection with respect to his ongoing practice; 
 
       xi)  Dr. Levy will undertake not to do physical examinations of patients, with the exception of his need to take 
            blood pressures because of medications prescribed, and will co-operate in the College s monitoring of this 
            condition; and 
 
      xii)  Dr. Levy will pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00, so long as it is permitted by law in the 
            circumstances of Dr. Levy s bankruptcy. 
 
In addition, the Discipline Committee orders and directs that if Dr. Levy fails to comply with sub-paragraphs (iii) to (xii) above, 
he will serve the remainder of his suspension, and, 
 
The results of this proceeding will be included in the register. 
 
On August 23, 2005, the Discipline Committee heard a motion to vary the order of the Discipline Committee dated May 16, 
2003 (above). 
 
The Committee removed the prohibition on Dr. Levy conducting physical examinations. 
 
       
       
                                                 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 24, 2003