Levy, Maurice (CPSO#: 59157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bathurst Medical Center
7117 Bathurst Street
Suite 205
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone: (905) 886-9033
Fax: (905) 886-5001
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Levy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levy ( CPSO# 59157 )

Business Address:
Bathurst Medical Centre
7117 Bathurst Street
Suite 205
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAURICE LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1993