Levy, Michelle Heather (CPSO#: 72266)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Family Medicine Clinic
6th Floor Southcott Hall
100 Forest Road
St. John's NL  A1A 3Z9
Phone: (709) 777-6301
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Zahariadis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Byron Family Medical Clinic 1228 Commissioners Rd W London ON N6K 1C7
Date Received: 16 Apr 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018