Levy, Michelle Rebecca (CPSO#: 86798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Sherman Health and Wellness Centre
9600 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: (289) 269-1522
Fax: (905) 303-9773
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Murray Street, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5158
Fax: (416) 586-3175
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Rebecca Levy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levy ( CPSO# 86798 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Sherman Health and Wellness Centre
Suite 300
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (289) 269-1522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE REBECCA LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009