Levy, Michelle (CPSO#: 74003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: Glied, Michelle (used until: 31 Oct 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Ave. E
Ste. 324
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 499-8242
Fax: (416) 499-3945
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medcan
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5980
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Levy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levy ( CPSO# 74003 )

Business Address:
Medcan
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
324 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 499-8242

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2005