Levytsky, Adrian Andrew (CPSO#: 68863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Levytsky and Slatkovsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Slatkovsky ( CPSO# 72440 )
Dr. A. Levytsky ( CPSO# 68863 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre Guelph
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone Number: (519) 824-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN ANDREW LEVYTSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVYTSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1999