Lewandowski, Bernard Joseph (CPSO#: 28230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Merivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K2G-3H8
Phone: 613-727-1072 Ext. 222
Fax: 613-727-5873
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernard Lewandowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lewandowski ( CPSO# 28230 )

Business Address:
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 727-1072

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD JOSEPH LEWANDOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWANDOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1985