Lewell, Michael Peter (CPSO#: 68748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
339 Winermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 667-6567
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ornge Transport Medicine
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Canada
Phone: 519 200 4298
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Lewell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lewell ( CPSO# 68748 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PETER LEWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000