Lewin, George William (CPSO#: 28321)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1975 to 14 Jun 1976
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009