Lewin, James Arthur (CPSO#: 17368)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1999