Lewin, Laura Lee (CPSO#: 58356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 224-1248
Fax: (613) 828-4895
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wiens Lewin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wiens ( CPSO# 58346 )
Dr. L. Lewin ( CPSO# 58356 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 224-1248

Business Address:
Suite 207
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 224-1248

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA LEE LEWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1989