Lewin, Michael Charles (CPSO#: 68145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
344 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W3
Phone: (705) 445-9044
Fax: (705) 445-8017
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael C. Lewin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2009

Dr. M. Lewin ( CPSO# 68145 )

Business Address:
344 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHARLES LEWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004