Lewis, Alison Elizabeth (CPSO#: 76528)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 01 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005