Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lewis, Gary Franklin (CPSO#: 61945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto General Hospital
Division Of Endocrinology
200 Elizabeth Street, EN12-218
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4270
Fax: (416) 340-3314
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lewis ( CPSO# 61945 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite EN12-218
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4270

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Cancer Institute
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY FRANKLIN LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1990