Lewis, Geraint Wyn (CPSO#: 31624)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Welsh

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geraint W. Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 11 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016