Lewis, Jacqueline Esther (CPSO#: 29447)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Oct 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015