Lewis, James Franklin (CPSO#: 52013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Room B3-115
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6288
Fax: (519) 646-6404
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.F. Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lewis ( CPSO# 52013 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Room B3-115 - 268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6288

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES FRANKLIN LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1984