Lewis, John Ralph (CPSO#: 61178)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 1994