Lewis, John Robert (CPSO#: 66784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary's Hospital
3830 Lacombe Avenue
Montreal QC  H3T 1M5
Canada
Phone: (514) 345-3511
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Mar 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995