Lewis, Marion Elizabeth Suzanne (CPSO#: 57103)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Petrowski, Marion Elizabeth Suzanne (used until: 15 Oct 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1991