Lewis, Paul Jeffrey (CPSO#: 51916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Western New York Medical Park
550 Orchard Park Road
Suite A105
West Seneca NY  14224
United States
Phone: (718) 677-6000
Fax: (716) 677-6006

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JEFFREY LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1984