Lewis, Ralph Brett (CPSO#: 65705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4098
Fax: (416) 480-6818
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ralph B. Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lewis ( CPSO# 65705 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room FG62
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4098

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RALPH BRETT LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996