Lewis, Ronald Thomas (CPSO#: 74530)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Division of Vascular Surgery, 1053 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015