Lewis, Sheldon Daniel (CPSO#: 59558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jackson Park Health Centre
2475 McDougall Street Suite 230
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 258-2230
Fax: (519) 258-5883
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lewis ( CPSO# 59558 )
Dr. J. Hurst ( CPSO# 59540 )

Business Address:
Jackson Park Health Centre
230 - 2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 258-2230

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELDON DANIEL LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989