Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lewis, Stephen Joel (CPSO#: 62300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite I E 442
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5851
Fax: (416) 603-3437
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
Room S-107
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-6439
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lewis ( CPSO# 62300 )
Dr. M. Fuchs ( CPSO# 69104 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
EWI-442 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5851

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Suite S-107
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOEL LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991