Lewis, Timothy Edward (CPSO#: 81464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 497-0110
Fax: (705) 497-0115
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lewis ( CPSO# 81464 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 497-0110

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-7525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY EDWARD LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010