Lewis, Valerie Susan (CPSO#: 58598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Baywood Centre
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 202
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-7593
Fax: (905) 683-7669
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Charles H Best Diabetes Centre
Brooklin ON  L1M 1Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 620-0360
Fax: (905) 620-0579
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE SUSAN LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1988