Lewis, William Frederick (CPSO#: 30108)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1977 to 14 Jun 1978
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2015