Lewittes, Leora Rebecca (CPSO#: 59476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Clinic
55 Avenue Road
Suite 2000, East Tower
Toronto ON  M5R 3L2
Phone: 416-849-5555
Fax: 416-849-5551
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Bernstein Diet & Health Clinics
Yonge & Eglington Clinic
2300 Yonge Street, Box 2390
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: 416-484-1440
Fax: 416-483-4468
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEORA REBECCA LEWITTES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWITTES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989