Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lewtas, Joanne Lawrence (CPSO#: 58492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church Street
Suite 309
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 201-0800
Fax: (905) 201-0018
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE LAWRENCE LEWTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWTAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1989