Ley, David Alan (CPSO#: 60401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ley ( CPSO# 60401 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALAN LEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1988