Lezack, Lisa Joy (CPSO#: 77503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 300 - 100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Lezack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lezack ( CPSO# 77503 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA JOY LEZACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEZACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2005