Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lezon-Giacomelli, Dianne Angela (CPSO#: 55741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Names: Giacomelli, Dianne Angela (used until: 15 Jun 1997 )     Lezon, Dianne Angela (used until: 07 Jul 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2398
Fax: (905) 813-4284
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Healthcare -CMHS
Halton Geriatric Mental Health
Outreach Program
5230 South Service Road
Burlington ON  L7L5K2
Canada
Phone: 905-681-8233
Fax: 905-681-8628
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C1A5
Canada
Phone: 416-521-4057
Fax: 416-521-4072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANNE ANGELA LEZON-GIACOMELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEZON-GIACOMELLI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986