Li, Amanda Minyen (CPSO#: 99797)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2013 to 10 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2017 to 28 Apr 2017
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Apr 2017